FL H0173 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-6-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Chapter No. 2022-19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-6-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Chapter No. 2022-19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires school to provide epilepsy or seizure disorder care to student; provides for creation & implementation of individualized seizure action plan for students with epilepsy or seizure disorders to receive health care at school; provides requirements for DOE, schools, school nurses & certain other school employees, & such plans.
Title
Care of Students with Epilepsy or Seizure Disorders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#26 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#619 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Education & Employment Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#619 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Education & Employment Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | Chapter No. 2022-19 | |
2022-03-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-03-22 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2022-03-02 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2022-03-02 | House | In Messages |
2022-03-02 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Substituted for SB 340 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Received |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2022-02-25 | Senate | In Messages |
2022-02-25 | House | Immediately certified |
2022-02-25 | House | CS passed; YEAS 106, NAYS 0 |
2022-02-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-24 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-02-24 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-02-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-17 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/24/2022) |
2022-02-09 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-02-09 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2022-02-09 | House | Reported out of Education & Employment Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Favorable by Education & Employment Committee |
2022-02-04 | House | Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda |
2022-02-02 | House | Now in Education & Employment Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Reported out of Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2022-02-02 | House | Favorable by Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2022-01-31 | House | Added to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-26 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-01-26 | House | Now in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2022-01-26 | House | Original reference removed: PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-25 | House | CS Filed |
2022-01-25 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-01-25 | House | Reported out of Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2022-01-25 | House | Favorable with CS by Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2022-01-21 | House | PCS added to Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-09-29 | House | Now in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-09-29 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2021-09-29 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-09-29 | House | Referred to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2021-09-29 | House | Referred to Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-09-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S340 (Similar To) 2022-03-02 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 173