FL H0171 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-9-1)
Status: Introduced on September 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 382
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides honorary designation of various transportation facilities in specified counties; directs DOT to erect suitable markers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation Facility Designations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-05HouseLaid on Table, refer to CS/SB 382
2018-03-05HouseSubstituted CS/SB 382
2018-03-02HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-02HouseAmendment(s) adopted (911557, 967469)
2018-03-02HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-27HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/18
2018-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-14HouseCS by Government Accountability Committee read 1st time
2018-02-14HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-02-13HouseCS by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0
2018-02-09HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 02/13/18, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-10-25HouseNow in Government Accountability Committee
2017-10-25HouseFavorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2017-10-18HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 10/25/17, 10:30 am, Reed Hall
2017-10-11HouseNow in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2017-10-11HouseFavorable by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2017-10-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 10/11/17, 3:30 pm, Reed Hall
2017-09-26HouseReferred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-09-21HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S358 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
H109 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Government Accountability Committee
H127 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Government Accountability Committee
H205 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Government Accountability Committee
H849 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Government Accountability Committee
H1163 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Government Accountability Committee
S330 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
S382 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-161
S948 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation
S1066 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback