FL H0167 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-01 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SM 160 (Adopted)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-01 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SM 160 (Adopted)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Urging United States Secretary of State to redesignate Revolutionary Armed Forces of Colombia as Foreign Terrorist Organization.
Title
Redesignate the Revolutionary Armed Forces of Colombia as a Foreign Terrorist Organization
Sponsors
House State Affairs Committee | Rep. Juan Porras [R] | Rep. Robin Bartleman [D] | Rep. David Borrero [R] |
Rep. Thomas Fabricio [R] | Rep. Berny Jacques [R] | Rep. Alejandro Rizo [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-14 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - House Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - House Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SM 160 (Adopted) |
2023-03-15 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2023-03-15 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2023-03-15 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2023-03-14 | House | CS Filed |
2023-03-14 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2023-03-14 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2023-03-14 | House | Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee |
2023-03-10 | House | PCS added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-02-08 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2023-02-08 | House | Reported out of Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2023-02-08 | House | Favorable by Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | Added to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee agenda |
2023-01-17 | House | Now in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2023-01-17 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2023-01-17 | House | Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2023-01-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S160 (Similar To) 2023-06-07 - Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State