FL H0167 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires physician to conduct test for, & inform woman seeking abortion of, presence of detectable fetal heartbeat; prohibits physician from performing or inducing abortion if fetal heartbeat is detected or if physician fails to conduct test to detect fetal heartbeat; provides exceptions; authorizes private civil cause of action for certain violations; provides for civil remedies & damages.
Title
Abortion
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-09-29 | House | Now in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2021-09-29 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-09-29 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-09-29 | House | Referred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2021-09-22 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
390 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 0111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 01112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 01113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 01119 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 027 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 028 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/167 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/167/BillText/Filed/PDF |