FL H0167 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5-1)
Status: Introduced on September 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides civil cause of action for victims of human trafficking against trafficker or facilitator; requires court to impose civil penalties in certain circumstances; provides for deposit or distribution of civil penalties; provides affirmative defense for owners or operators of public lodging establishments; requires educational programs for employees of public food service & lodging establishment regarding human trafficking; specifies proof of compliance requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Victims of Human Trafficking

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied on Calendar
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-25HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-22HouseCS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
2018-02-22HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-02-21HouseCS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2018-02-19HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/21/18, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
2018-01-30HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/01/18, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall --Temporarily Postponed
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-12-07HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2017-12-06HouseFavorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2017-11-29HouseOn Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 12/06/17, 1:30 pm, Morris Hall
2017-11-08HouseNow in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2017-11-08HouseFavorable by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2017-11-01HouseOn Committee agenda-- Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee, 11/08/17, 1:30 pm, Sumner Hall
2017-09-26HouseReferred to Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2017-09-21HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H169 (Related) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
S338 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
S340 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
S342 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
S1044 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
S1046 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
509210Amended CodeSee Bill Text
772104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
787061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9511Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback