FL H0163 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires application for driver license or ID card to provide for male, female, or nonbinary gender designation.
Title
Driver License and Identification Card Gender Designation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | Died in Transportation & Modals Subcommittee |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-01-17 | House | Now in Transportation & Modals Subcommittee |
2023-01-17 | House | Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2023-01-17 | House | Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-01-17 | House | Referred to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee |
2023-01-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S874 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Transportation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
320 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
98 | 093 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/163 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/163/BillText/Filed/PDF |