FL H0163 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-50
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Removes provisions for study of feasibility of collecting E911 fee on sale of prepaid wireless telecommunications service; prohibits collection of fee until after certain date; revises limitation on amount of funds received by county from E911 fee which may be carried forward to following year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prepaid Wireless Telecommunications Service [EPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0044 - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-26 - House - House Roll Call No. 0962 - Passage (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-11 Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-50
2010-04-30 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -HJ 01700
2010-04-26 Ordered enrolled -HJ 01092
2010-04-26 In Messages; Received -SJ 00873; Referred to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Community Affairs; Judiciary; Finance and Tax; General Government Appropriations -SJ 00873; Withdrawn from Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Community Affairs; Judiciary; Finance and Tax; General Government Appropriations -SJ 00862; Substituted for CS/CS/CS/SB 1202 -SJ 00862; Read 2nd time -SJ 00862; Read 3rd time -SJ 00862; CS passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 0 -SJ 00863
2010-04-26 Read 3rd time -HJ 01059; CS passed as amended; YEAS 112 NAYS 0 -HJ 01060
2010-04-23 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00946; Amendment(s) adopted -HJ 00946
2010-04-15 Placed on Calendar -HJ 00722
2010-04-14 Favorable by- General Government Policy Council; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -HJ 00722
2010-04-12 CS read 1st time on 04/12/10 -HJ 00658; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20; Now in General Government Policy Council -HJ 00661; On Council agenda-- General Government Policy Council, 04/14/10, 9:15 am, Morris Hall
2010-04-09 CS/CS by Finance & Tax Council; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 00663
2010-04-07 On Council agenda-- Finance & Tax Council, 04/09/10, 11:45 am, 404-H
2010-03-31 Original reference(s) removed: Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC); CS referred to Finance & Tax Council; General Government Policy Council -HJ 00448; Now in Finance & Tax Council
2010-03-30 CS read 1st time on 03/30/10 -HJ 00420; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20
2010-03-25 CS by Energy & Utilities Policy (GGPC); YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -HJ 00425
2010-03-23 On Committee agenda-- Energy & Utilities Policy (GGPC), 03/25/10, 2:45 pm, Morris Hall
2010-03-15 On Committee agenda-- Energy & Utilities Policy (GGPC), 03/17/10, 2:15 pm, Morris Hall --Temporarily deferred
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Energy & Utilities Policy (GGPC); Finance & Tax Council; Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC); General Government Policy Council -HJ 00021
2009-10-23 Referred to Energy & Utilities Policy (GGPC); Finance & Tax Council; Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC); General Government Policy Council
2009-10-01 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S1202 (Similar To) 2010-04-26 - Read 3rd time -SJ 00862; Amendment(s) adopted (703208, 348766, 254308, 143616) -SJ 00862; Substituted CS/CS/HB 163 -SJ 00862; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 163 (Ch. 2010-50) -SJ 00862

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
0365172Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0365173Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=0163&Chamber=House&Year=2010
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb016300.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb016301c1.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb016302c2.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb016303e1.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/hHB01630426100962.html
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/SHB01630426100044.html

Bill Comments

feedback