FL H0159 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-5-2)
Status: Passed on April 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Chapter No. 2024-121
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes licensed pharmacists to screen for HIV exposure & order & dispense HIV infection prevention drugs in accordance with written supervisory protocol; requires Board of Pharmacy to adopt rules.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HIV Infection Prevention Drugs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#936 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#39 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#639 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-29 Chapter No. 2024-121
2024-04-26 Approved by Governor
2024-04-16 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2024-03-06HouseOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2024-03-06HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 113, NAYS 0
2024-03-06HouseAmendment 581084 Concur
2024-03-06HouseAdded to Senate Message List
2024-03-05HouseIn Messages
2024-03-05SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2024-03-05SenateRead 3rd time
2024-03-05SenateAmendment(s) adopted (581084)
2024-03-05SenateRead 2nd time
2024-03-05SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 1320
2024-03-05SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2024-03-05SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2024-02-27SenateReceived
2024-02-23SenateReferred to Rules
2024-02-22SenateIn Messages
2024-02-22HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 117, NAYS 0
2024-02-22HouseRead 3rd time
2024-02-21HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2024-02-21HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2024-02-21HouseAmendment 150497 adopted
2024-02-21HouseRead 2nd time
2024-02-15House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
2024-02-15HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (2/21/2024)
2024-02-15HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2024-02-15HouseCS Filed
2024-02-15HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2024-02-15HouseReported out of Health & Human Services Committee
2024-02-15HouseFavorable with CS by Health & Human Services Committee
2024-02-13HouseAdded to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
2024-02-05House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2024-02-05HouseNow in Health & Human Services Committee
2024-02-05HouseReferred to Health & Human Services Committee
2024-02-05HouseOriginal reference removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2024-02-02HouseCS Filed
2024-02-02HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2024-02-02HouseReported out of Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
2024-02-01HouseFavorable with CS by Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
2024-01-30HouseAdded to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee agenda
2024-01-09House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2023-11-02HouseNow in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
2023-11-02HouseReferred to Health & Human Services Committee
2023-11-02HouseReferred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2023-11-02HouseReferred to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
2023-10-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1320 (Similar To) 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 159

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4651861Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/159
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/159/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/159/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/159/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/159/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/159/BillText/e2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/159/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/159/Amendment/368529/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/159/Amendment/150497/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/159/Analyses/h0159.HRS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/159/Analyses/h0159a.HRS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/159/Analyses/h0159b.HHS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/159/Analyses/h0159c.HHS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/159/Analyses/h0159z.HRS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/159/Analyses/h0159z1.HRS.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=71200&IsPCB=0&BillId=78759
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=71974&IsPCB=0&BillId=78759
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/159/Vote/HouseVote_h00159e1639.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/159/Vote/SenateVote_h00159e1039.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/159/Vote/HouseVote_h00159e1936.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback