FL H0159 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revises conditions under which certain dealers are subject to sales tax; deletes exemption for certain dealers from collecting local option surtaxes; provides that certain marketplace providers are subject to registration, collection, & remittance requirements for sales taxes; requires marketplace providers to provide certification to marketplace sellers; specifies requirements for marketplace sellers; requires marketplace providers to allow DOR to audit books & records; provides that marketplace seller is liable for sales tax collection & remittance; authorizes marketplace providers & marketplace sellers to enter into agreements to recover certain taxes, interest, & penalties; grants DOR settlement & compromise authority for marketplace sales; deletes authority of DOR to negotiate collection allowance with certain dealers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and Use Tax

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in Ways and Means Committee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-09-25HouseReferred to Ways and Means Committee; Commerce Committee; Appropriations Committee
2019-09-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S126 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2120596Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21205965Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21206Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21218Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21220Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21327Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback