FL H0157 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Proposing amendments to the State Constitution to limit the terms of office for a member of a district school board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limitation on Terms of Office for Members of a District School Board

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#457 (Y: 79 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Rules
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-03-02SenateReceived
2020-02-27SenateReferred to Rules
2020-02-26SenateIn Messages
2020-02-20HousePassed; YEAS 79 NAYS 39
2020-02-20HouseRead 3rd time
2020-02-19HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-02-19HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/19/20
2020-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-06HouseFavorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 11 NAYS 4
2020-02-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 02/06/20, 12:00 pm, Webster Hall
2020-01-29HouseNow in Education Committee
2020-01-29HouseFavorable by Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 5
2020-01-27HouseOn Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee, 01/29/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2020-01-21HouseNow in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
2020-01-21HouseFavorable by PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 4
2020-01-16HouseOn Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee, 01/21/20, 3:00 pm, Reed Hall
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-09-23HouseReferred to PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Education Committee
2019-09-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1216 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
S1480 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Ethics and Elections

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback