FL H0157 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Introduced on September 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-20 - CS adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizes public health risk created by pornography & acknowledges need for education, prevention, research, & policy change to protect citizens of this state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Health Risk Created by Pornography

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-20HouseCS adopted
2018-02-20HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-15HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/20/18
2018-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-13HouseFavorable by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 25 NAYS 1
2018-02-09HouseOn Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 02/13/18, 3:00 pm, Webster Hall
2018-01-26HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2018-01-26HouseCS referred to Commerce Committee
2018-01-26HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Rules and Policy Committee
2018-01-19HouseCS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
2018-01-19HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-18HouseCS by Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 1
2018-01-16HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 01/18/18, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-09-26HouseReferred to Health and Human Services Committee; Rules and Policy Committee
2017-09-18HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S480 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback