FL H0155 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Urges Congress to ensure that U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs sufficiently implements both letter & spirit of VA Maintaining Internal Systems & Strengthening Integrated Outside Networks (MISSION) Act of 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VA MISSION Act of 2018

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-09-23HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2019-09-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S420 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback