FL H0151 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires community development districts to obtain a valuation before acquiring certain property.
Title
Community Development Districts
Sponsors
Rep. John Cortes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-01-02 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1250 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/151 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/151/BillText/Filed/PDF |