FL H0141 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes DEP to provide grants for certain projects identified in Indian River Lagoon Comprehensive Conservation & Management Plan; directs DEP to submit annual report regarding projects to Governor & Legislature; requires local governments to submit annual reports regarding projects to DEP & water management districts; requires wastewater facilities permitted under National Pollutant Discharge Elimination System program that unlawfully discharge certain amount of raw or partially treated sewage to provide written notification; provides penalties; provides for such facilities to make certain upgrades & repairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water Quality Improvements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in State Affairs Committee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-26HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-03-26HouseFavorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2019-03-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 8:30 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-15HouseNow in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-14HouseCS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-14HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-12HouseCS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2019-03-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, 03/12/19, 1:30 pm, 12 HOB
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2018-12-28HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S216 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
S368 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
S1758 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
H1395 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3734594Amended CodeSee Bill Text
375041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4030771Amended CodeSee Bill Text
403141Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback