FL H0139 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-6-2)
Status: Introduced on September 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-20 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 472
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requests Joint Committee on Library of Congress to approve replacement of statue of Confederate General Edmund Kirby Smith in National Statuary Hall Collection with statue of Mary McLeod Bethune; provides for transfer of ownership of statue of General Edmund Kirby Smith to state; requires Division of Cultural Affairs of DOS to take possession of statue & make available for public display.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

National Statuary Hall

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-20HouseLaid on Table, refer to SB 472
2018-02-20HouseSubstituted SB 472
2018-02-15HouseCS/CS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time
2018-02-15HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/20/18
2018-02-15HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-15HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-02-14HouseCS/CS by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 24 NAYS 0
2018-02-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/14/18, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
2018-01-09HouseCS by Government Accountability Committee read 1st time
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-10-12HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2017-10-12HouseCS referred to Appropriations Committee
2017-10-12HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Rules and Policy Committee
2017-10-11HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2017-10-10HouseCS by Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 1
2017-10-03HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 10/10/17, 9:30 am, Morris Hall
2017-09-14HouseReferred to Government Accountability Committee; Rules and Policy Committee
2017-09-06HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H73 (Similar To) 2017-10-25 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S184 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
S472 (Similar To) 2018-03-21 - Chapter No. 2018-19

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback