FL H0131 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on September 20 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-11 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires DVA & DOH to establish & administer Military Medics and Corpsmen of Florida program; provides program purposes; provides for eligibility; provides program components; authorizes medically trained veterans participating in program to perform certain medical activities under specified supervision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Military Medics and Corpsmen of Florida Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-09-29HouseNow in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
2021-09-29HouseReferred to Health & Human Services Committee
2021-09-29HouseReferred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-09-29HouseReferred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2021-09-29HouseReferred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
2021-09-20HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S466 (Same As) 2022-01-13 - CS by Health Policy; YEAS 7 NAYS 0

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
295126Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback