FL H0131 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires supervisors of elections to enter into agreements with clerks of circuit courts to receive specified information; requires supervisors of elections to compare certain information with statewide voter registration system; requires DHSMV to furnish monthly to DOS list of persons who identified themselves as aliens; requires DOS to compare such list with statewide voter registration system & provide names of registered voters who are aliens to supervisor of elections of county in which voter is registered.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voter Registration Maintenance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#237 (Y: 71 N: 40 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Ethics and Elections
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-25SenateReceived
2019-04-25SenateReferred to Ethics and Elections; Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations
2019-04-25SenateIn Messages
2019-04-25HousePassed; YEAS 71 NAYS 40
2019-04-25HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-24HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-24HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-18HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/19
2019-04-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-08HouseFavorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 2
2019-04-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/08/19, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-04-03HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-04-02HouseFavorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2019-03-29HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/02/19, 1:00 pm, Reed Hall
2019-03-13HouseNow in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-13HouseFavorable by Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 1
2019-03-11HouseOn Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee, 03/13/19, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2018-12-20HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S230 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
98065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98093Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback