FL H0127 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 31 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-10-25 - Now in Government Accountability Committee
Pending: House Government Accountability Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides honorary designation of certain transportation facility in specified county; directs DOT to erect suitable markers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation Facility Designations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-25HouseNow in Government Accountability Committee
2017-10-25HouseFavorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2017-10-18HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 10/25/17, 10:30 am, Reed Hall
2017-10-11HouseNow in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2017-10-11HouseFavorable by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2017-10-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 10/11/17, 3:30 pm, Reed Hall
2017-09-06HouseReferred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-08-31HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback