FL H0127 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-12 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-12 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides exemption from public records requirements for information concerning clients of domestic violence advocacy organizations or referral services; requires written consent of client for disclosure of certain information; provides exceptions; provides for future legislative review & repeal of exemptions; provides statement of public necessity.
Title
Pub. Rec./Clients of Domestic Violence Advocacy Organizations or Referral Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-12 | House | Withdrawn prior to introduction |
2015-01-12 | House | Withdrawn from Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Government Operations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-01-08 | House | Referred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Government Operations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2014-12-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0125 (Related) 2015-01-12 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S0308 (Similar To) 2015-01-23 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S0306 (Similar To) 2015-01-23 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S0308 (Similar To) 2015-01-23 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S0306 (Similar To) 2015-01-23 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/127 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0127/BillText/Filed/PDF |