FL H0123 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits bullying or harassment of certain association members; provides association requirements; provides civil penalties; provides immunity from certain causes of action for damages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bullying and Harassment in Community Associations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-09-06HouseReferred to Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2017-08-31HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1366 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Regulated Industries

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback