FL H0121 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Introduced on August 31 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-12-06 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revises short title & legislative intent; revises penalties for violations of provisions re: texting while driving; provides enhanced penalties for violations committed in school zones & crossings; requires law enforcement agencies to adopt policies prohibiting racial profiling in enforcement; removes requirement that enforcement be accomplished as secondary action.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Texting While Driving

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-06HouseWithdrawn prior to introduction
2017-12-06HouseWithdrawn from Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-09-06HouseReferred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-08-31HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S72 (Similar To) 2017-09-25 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S90 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
H33 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
316305Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback