FL H0119 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-22 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-22 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes charter school student to participate in interscholastic extracurricular activities at private school under certain circumstances.
Title
Interscholastic Extracurricular Activities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-22 | House | Withdrawn prior to introduction |
2017-02-22 | House | Withdrawn from PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2017-01-09 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2016-12-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1134 (Same As) 2017-02-23 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/119 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0119/BillText/Filed/PDF |