FL H0111 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises practice requirements for autonomous advanced practice registered nurse.
Title
Autonomous Practice by an Advanced Practice Registered Nurse
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Maggard [R] | Rep. Sam Killebrew [R] | Rep. Stan McClain [R] | Rep. Anthony Sabatini [R] |
Rep. Emily Slosberg-King [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-01-20 | House | Referred to Professions and Public Health Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-12-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S424 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/111 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/111/BillText/Filed/PDF |