FL H0111 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates task force to evaluate procurement laws & policies & make specified recommendations; specifies membership of task force; provides meeting requirements; provides for administrative & technical support of task force; requires task force to submit report to Governor & Legislature by certain date; provides for termination of task force.
Title
Department of Management Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-09-06 | House | Referred to Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2017-08-29 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S368 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/111 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/111/BillText/Filed/PDF |