FL H0107 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits employer from providing less favorable employment opportunities to employees based on their sex; provides civil penalties; prohibits employer from taking employment actions against employees; prohibits employer from engaging in certain activities relating to wages & benefits; prohibits employer from requiring employees to sign certain waivers & documents; authorizes employer to confirm wage or salary history under certain conditions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Discrimination in Labor and Employment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30HouseDied in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-01-20HouseReferred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee; Civil Justice and Property Rights Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2020-12-21HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S256 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
H1077 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
44807Amended CodeSee Bill Text
448102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
448111Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback