FL H0107 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Government Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires DHSMV to create veteran identification card for certain purposes; provides for design of card; provides eligibility requirements; prohibits use of card for certain purposes; authorizes use of card as proof of veteran status for obtaining waivers of license & registration fees relating to certain businesses & occupations & for expedited service of application for license to carry concealed weapons or firearms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veteran Identification

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Government Accountability Committee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-10-25HouseNow in Government Accountability Committee
2017-10-25HouseFavorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2017-10-18HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 10/25/17, 10:30 am, Reed Hall
2017-10-11HouseNow in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2017-10-11HouseFavorable by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2017-10-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 10/11/17, 1:00 pm, 12 HOB
2017-09-06HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-08-28HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S328 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3220511Amended CodeSee Bill Text
472015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4936105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4936107Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4936202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4936302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4936402Amended CodeSee Bill Text
501015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
501605Amended CodeSee Bill Text
501607Amended CodeSee Bill Text
50703Amended CodeSee Bill Text
52702Amended CodeSee Bill Text
539001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
559904Amended CodeSee Bill Text
559928Amended CodeSee Bill Text
626171Amended CodeSee Bill Text
79006Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback