FL H0105 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires DOE to prepare standards & curriculum related to history of African Americans; authorizes DOE to seek input from or contract with specified entities to develop specified training & resources relating to such instruction; provides requirements for specified entities relating to history of Holocaust & history of African Americans instruction; requires certain statewide, standardized assessments to include curricula content from history of Holocaust & history of African Americans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Required Instruction in the History of the Holocaust and of African Americans

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-01-20HouseReferred to Secondary Education and Career Development Subcommittee; Early Learning and Elementary Education Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education and Employment Committee
2020-12-21HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S190 (Similar To) 2021-02-03 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S772 (Similar To) 2021-03-02 - Introduced
S1962 (Similar To) 2021-03-04 - Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100342Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10034551Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100822Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback