FL H0105 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Education Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Education Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires percentage of unencumbered funds to be allocated to VPK Education Program; provides for use of funds.
Title
Allocation and Expenditure of State Lottery Revenues
Sponsors
Sen. Janet Cruz [D] | Rep. Reggie Fullwood [D] | Rep. Larry Lee [D] | Rep. Alan Williams [D] |
Rep. Gwyndolen Clarke-Reed [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Died in Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-01-23 | House | Referred to Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Choice and Innovation Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2013-01-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0350 (Same As) 2013-05-03 - Died in Education
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/105 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0105/BillText/Filed/PDF |