FL H0105 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 37-7)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-48
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Designates act "Justice Sandra Day O'Connor Civics Education Act"; provides requirement that reading portion of language arts curriculum include civics education content for all grade levels; provides requirements for civics education course that student must successfully complete for middle grades promotion; requires administration of end-of-course assessment in civics education as field test at middle school level, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civics Education [SPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0010 - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-18 - House - House Roll Call No. 0597 - Passage (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-11 Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-48
2010-04-30 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -HJ 01700
2010-04-22 Ordered enrolled -HJ 00918
2010-04-21 Read 3rd time -SJ 00664; CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 00664
2010-04-16 Withdrawn from Education Pre-K - 12; Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations -SJ 00631; Substituted for CS/SB 1096 -SJ 00631; Read 2nd time -SJ 00631
2010-04-14 Received -SJ 00575; Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations -SJ 00575
2010-03-23 In Messages
2010-03-18 Read 3rd time -HJ 00327; CS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 -HJ 00327
2010-03-16 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00294; Amendment(s) failed -HJ 00295
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to PreK-12 Policy (EPC); Education Policy Council -HJ 00017; On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Policy (EPC), 01/13/10, 10:00 am, Morris Hall; CS by PreK-12 Policy (EPC); YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 00166; CS read 1st time on 03/02/10 -HJ 00155; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20; Now in Education Policy Council -HJ 00163; On Council agenda-- Education Policy Council, 02/17/10, 9:45 am, Morris Hall; Favorable by- Education Policy Council; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 00169; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00169
2010-02-17 Favorable by- Education Policy Council; YEAS 14 NAYS 0; Placed on Calendar
2010-02-10 On Council agenda-- Education Policy Council, 02/17/10, 9:45 am, Morris Hall
2010-01-25 Now in Education Policy Council
2010-01-19 Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20
2010-01-13 CS by PreK-12 Policy (EPC); YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2010-01-06 On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Policy (EPC), 01/13/10, 10:00 am, Morris Hall
2009-10-12 Referred to PreK-12 Policy (EPC); Education Policy Council
2009-09-11 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S1096 (Similar To) 2010-04-16 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00631; Amendment(s) adopted (672830) -SJ 00631; Substituted CS/HB 105 -SJ 00631; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 105 (Ch. 2010-48) -SJ 00631

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100341Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10034156Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100822Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100834Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback