FL H0101 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on September 14 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-27 - 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides authorized & prohibited activities related to qualifying improvements to real property to be financed by non-ad valorem assessments; provides requirements for local governments, program administrators, & PACE contractors; specifies types of contracts that are unenforceable; requires local governments that have authorized qualifying improvement programs to annually post specified information on their websites.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Improvements to Real Property

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-25 - House - House Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-27House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2022-01-27HouseCS Filed
2022-01-27HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2022-01-27HouseReported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2022-01-25HouseFavorable with CS by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2022-01-21HousePCS added to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-09-22HouseNow in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-09-22HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-09-22HouseReferred to Ways & Means Committee
2021-09-22HouseReferred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2021-09-22HouseReferred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-09-14HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S228 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Now in Rules

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16308Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback