FL H0099 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Decreases fees & charges for reinstatement of driver license, certificates of title, registration of motor vehicle, license plates, validation decals, & mobile home stickers, initial registration application for certain vehicles, driver's license examinations, services & documents, driver's licenses, return of license suspended, & DUI program enrollment, etc.
Title
Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED) | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED); Finance & Tax Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development -HJ 00016 | |
2009-10-12 | Referred to Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED); Finance & Tax Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development | |
2009-09-08 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0071 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED)
S2036 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations
H1573 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED)
S2554 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S1436 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Conference Committee
S2036 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations
H1573 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED)
S2554 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S1436 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Conference Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0316 | 066 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0318 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0319 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0319 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0319 | 323 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0319 | 324 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0320 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0320 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0320 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0320 | 0607 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0320 | 072 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0320 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0320 | 0801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0320 | 0804 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0320 | 08046 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0320 | 08048 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0320 | 0805 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0320 | 08056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0320 | 642 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0321 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0322 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0322 | 135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0322 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0322 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0322 | 2715 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0322 | 29 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0322 | 293 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |