FL H0095 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Proposes amendment to State Constitution to provide that neither house of Legislature may vote on bill that would affect access to abortion services unless at least half of members of that house are women.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Representation of Women

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in Civil Justice Subcommittee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-09-23HouseReferred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee; Judiciary Committee
2019-08-26HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S60 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback