FL H0093 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes certain municipalities to establish pilot programs to regulate or ban disposable plastic bags; provides program criteria; provides for program expiration; directs participating municipalities to collect data & submit reports to municipal governing bodies & DEP; defines term "coastal community."
Title
Disposable Plastic Bags
Sponsors
Rep. David Richardson [D] | Rep. Thad Altman [R] | Rep. Daisy Baez [D] | Rep. Joseph Geller [D] |
Rep. Kristin Jacobs [D] | Rep. Holly Raschein [R] | Rep. Emily Slosberg-King [D] | Rep. Carlos Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-01-09 | House | Referred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Careers and Competition Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2016-12-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0162 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
403 | 70325 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 7033 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/93 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0093/BillText/Filed/PDF |