FL H0085 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Chapter No. 2018-32
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes DOS to become member of nongovernmental entity to verify voter registration information; establishes requirements for such memberships; requires DHSMV to provide specified information to DOS; establishes reporting requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voter Registration List Maintenance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#559 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21 Chapter No. 2018-32
2018-03-19 Approved by Governor
2018-03-09 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-02-27HouseOrdered enrolled
2018-02-21SenateCS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 370
2018-02-21SenateRead 3rd time
2018-02-08SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-02-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-08SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 276
2018-02-08SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-08SenateWithdrawn from Ethics and Elections; Appropriations; Rules
2018-02-07SenateReceived
2018-02-07SenateReferred to Ethics and Elections; Appropriations; Rules
2018-02-07SenateIn Messages
2018-01-31HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 113 NAYS 0
2018-01-31HouseRead 3rd time
2018-01-31HouseAmendment(s) adopted (782859)
2018-01-31HouseRead 2nd time
2018-01-25HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/31/18
2018-01-19HouseCS by Public Integrity and Ethics Committee read 1st time
2018-01-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-01-18HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-18HouseCS by- Public Integrity and Ethics Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2018-01-16HouseOn Committee agenda-- Public Integrity and Ethics Committee, 01/18/18, 10:30 am, Sumner Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-10-25HouseNow in Public Integrity and Ethics Committee
2017-10-25HouseFavorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2017-10-18HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 10/25/17, 10:30 am, Reed Hall
2017-10-11HouseNow in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2017-10-11HouseFavorable by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2017-10-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, 10/11/17, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2017-08-30HouseReferred to Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Public Integrity and Ethics Committee
2017-08-23HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H87 (Related) 2018-03-21 - Chapter No. 2018-33
S276 (Same As) 2018-02-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 85
S278 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 87

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
98075Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback