FL H0083 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that peer specialists are essential element of coordinated system of care in recovery from substance use disorder or mental illness; revises background screening requirements for certain peer specialists; revises requirements for certification as peer specialist; requires DCF to develop training program for peer specialists; provides for reimbursement of peer specialist services; encourages Medicaid managed care plans to use peer specialists in providing recovery services.
Title
Mental Health and Substance Use Disorders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-01-15 | House | Referred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-12-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S130 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Messages
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
394 | 4573 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 4073 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 417 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/83 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/83/BillText/Filed/PDF |