FL H0079 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4-2)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 184 (Ch. 2021-93)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 184 (Ch. 2021-93)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Division of Emergency Management to identify & maintain inventory of certain digitally displayed automatic changeable facing signs; requires FDLE, in cooperation with other agencies, to establish & implement Purple Alert concerning certain missing adults.
Title
Purple Alert
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Appropriations Committee (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Appropriations Committee (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | House | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 184 (Ch. 2021-93) |
2021-04-27 | House | Substituted CS/CS/SB 184 |
2021-04-26 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading |
2021-04-23 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading |
2021-04-21 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading |
2021-04-20 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2021-04-20 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-04-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-15 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2021) |
2021-03-26 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-03-26 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2021-03-25 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2021-03-24 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-24 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2021-03-17 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-03-16 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-16 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-16 | House | Reported out of Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-15 | House | Favorable with CS by Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-11 | House | Added to Appropriations Committee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-17 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Reported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-02-17 | House | Favorable by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | Added to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda |
2021-01-15 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Judiciary Committee |
2020-12-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S184 (Same As) 2021-06-17 - Chapter No. 2021-93
S1670 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 1194 (Ch. 2021-188)
S1670 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 1194 (Ch. 2021-188)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
252 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
937 | 0201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
937 | 0205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
937 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
937 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |