FL H0079 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Cites act as "HIV Prevention Justice Act"; provides exception to allow donation of human tissue by person with HIV under certain circumstances; expands scope of unlawful acts by person infected with sexually transmissible disease to include HIV; reclassifies specified criminal offenses.
Title
HIV Prevention
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Judiciary Committee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-19 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Favorable by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 26 NAYS 3 |
2019-03-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 03/18/19, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2019-03-05 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-27 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-22 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-02-21 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 3 |
2019-02-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 02/21/19, 4:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Judiciary Committee |
2018-12-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S846 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
S642 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), HB 5011 (Ch. 2019-95), CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)
S642 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), HB 5011 (Ch. 2019-95), CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
381 | 0041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
384 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
384 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
384 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 0877 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
960 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |