FL H0077 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes district school board to use advanced degree in setting salary schedule for specified employees; requires each district school board to adopt salary schedule for specified employees; authorizes rather than requires district school board to adopt performance salary schedule; authorizes rather than requires district school board to provide for specified salary supplements.
Title
Instructional Personnel and School Administrator Salary Schedules
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2018-12-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1108 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Education
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 333 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/77 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/77/BillText/Filed/PDF |