FL H0077 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates "Internet Poker Consumer Protection & Revenue Generation Act of 2011"; provides for intrastate Internet poker to be provided to public by cardroom operators through state Internet poker network operated by Internet poker hub operators; provides for licensure, administration, & regulation by Division of Pari-mutuel Wagering of DBPR.
Title
Internet Poker
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 12 | |
2011-01-10 | Referred to Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Committee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 12 | |
2010-12-16 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0812 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/77 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0077/BillText/Filed/HTML |