FL H0075 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes use of drones by law enforcement agencies & other specified entities for specified purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expanded Uses of Unmanned Aircraft

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#135 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Criminal Justice
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-24SenateReceived
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Infrastructure and Security; Rules
2019-04-23SenateIn Messages
2019-04-17HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
2019-04-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-17HouseAmendment(s) adopted (309893)
2019-04-17HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19
2019-03-11HouseCS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
2019-03-11HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-08HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-07HouseCS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 1
2019-03-05HouseCS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time
2019-03-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/07/19, 3:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-25HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2019-02-20HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-02-19HouseCS by State Affairs Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0
2019-02-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/19/19, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-02-06HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-02-06HouseFavorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 1
2019-01-30HouseOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 02/06/19, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
2019-01-03HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee; Judiciary Committee
2018-12-04HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S132 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
S766 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules
H1131 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
93450Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback