FL H0073 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 20 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, 10/16/19, 12:30 pm, 12 HOB
Pending: House Agriculture And Natural Resources Subcommittee Committee
Hearing: Oct 16 @ 12:30 pm in 12 HOB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Specifies requirements for contracts between residential recycling collectors or recovered materials processing facilities & counties or municipalities for collection or processing of residential recycling material; prohibits counties & municipalities from requiring collection, transport, or processing of contaminated recyclable material by residential recycling collectors or recovered materials processing facilities; prohibits local governments from requiring further verification from DEP for certain projects; revises types of dock & pier replacements & repairs that are exempt from such verification & certain permitting requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environmental Regulation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-09HouseOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, 10/16/19, 12:30 pm, 12 HOB
2019-09-23HouseReferred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2019-08-20HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S326 (Same As) 2019-10-15 - Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Community Affairs; Rules

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
403706Amended CodeSee Bill Text
403813Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback