FL H0071 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 76-42)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 76-42)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urges Congress to recognize veteran suicide & fully fund suicide prevention efforts by United States Department of Veterans Affairs.
Title
Recognizing Veteran Suicide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#168 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Received |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-04-15 | Senate | In Messages |
2021-04-15 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-15 | House | Adopted |
2021-04-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-08 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/15/2021) |
2021-03-10 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-03-10 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2021-03-10 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Favorable by State Affairs Committee |
2021-03-08 | House | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-16 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2021-02-16 | House | Reported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-02-16 | House | Favorable by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-02-09 | House | Added to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda |
2021-01-15 | House | Referred to Local Administration and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2020-12-15 | House | Filed |