FL H0071 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on August 21 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-11-02 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Deletes exception for persons under 18 years of age to be issued marriage license; deletes requirement that one party be male & other party be female to be issued marriage license; repeals provisions relating to issuance of marriage licenses to persons under 18 years of age.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marriage Licenses

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-02HouseWithdrawn prior to introduction
2017-11-02HouseWithdrawn from Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Health Quality Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2017-08-30HouseReferred to Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Health Quality Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2017-08-21HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S140 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Chapter No. 2018-81
S208 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
H335 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 140

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7410305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
74104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7410405Amended CodeSee Bill Text
74105Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback