FL H0071 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Chapter No. 2015-131
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Chapter No. 2015-131
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires public accommodation to permit use of service animal by individual with disability; provides conditions for public accommodation to exclude or remove service animal; revises penalties for certain persons or entities who interfere with use of service animal; provides penalty for knowing & willful misrepresentation with respect to use or training of service animal.
Title
Service Animals
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | Rep. Jimmie Smith [R] | Sen. Ben Albritton [R] | Sen. Dennis Baxley [R] |
Sen. Gayle Harrell [R] | Rep. Chris Sprowls [R] | Rep. Clovis Watson [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#32 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#42 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#42 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-15 | Chapter No. 2015-131 | |
2015-06-11 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2015-04-24 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2015-04-24 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 414 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Withdrawn from Commerce and Tourism; Community Affairs; Fiscal Policy |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Received |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Community Affairs; Fiscal Policy |
2015-04-01 | Senate | In Messages |
2015-03-27 | House | CS passed; YEAS 112 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-26 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-03-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-24 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/26/15 |
2015-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-19 | House | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-17 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/19/15, 12:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2015-03-16 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2015-03-13 | House | CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time |
2015-03-13 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-03-11 | House | CS by Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-09 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/11/15, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-10 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2015-02-10 | House | Favorable by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2015-02-03 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 02/10/15, 10:30 am, Webster Hall |
2014-12-19 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2014-12-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0414 (Similar To) 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 71 (Ch. 2015-131)