FL H0067 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Chapter No. 2021-18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Chapter No. 2021-18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies additional circumstances under which a public defender may not be appointed to represent a defendant.
Title
Public Defender Duties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#29 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House Justice Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#29 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House Justice Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | Chapter No. 2021-18 | |
2021-05-07 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-05-07 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2021-04-08 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2021-04-08 | House | In Messages |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Substituted for SB 752 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Received |
2021-04-07 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2021-04-07 | Senate | In Messages |
2021-04-01 | House | Passed; YEAS 116, NAYS 0 |
2021-04-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-31 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-03-31 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-25 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/31/2021) |
2021-03-24 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-03-24 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Favorable by Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2021-03-08 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-08 | House | Reported out of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-08 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-04 | House | Added to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-17 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-17 | House | Reported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-02-17 | House | Favorable by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | Added to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda |
2021-01-15 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2020-12-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S752 (Same As) 2021-04-08 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 67 (Ch. 2021-18)