FL H0067 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4-1)
Status: Introduced on November 30 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 96
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Expands definitions of "police canine" & "SAR canine" to include any canine that is owned, or service of which is employed, by correctional agency; increases penalty for intentionally & knowingly causing great bodily harm, permanent disability, or death to, or using deadly weapon upon, police canines or horses, fire canines, or SAR canines.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Police, Fire, and Search and Rescue Canines and Police Horses

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10HouseLaid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 96
2019-04-10HouseSubstituted CS/CS/SB 96
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19
2019-03-25HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-25HouseCS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
2019-03-22HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-21HouseCS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2019-03-19HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/21/19, 8:30 am, Sumner Hall
2019-03-07HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2019-03-07HouseFavorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-03-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/07/19, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-06HouseNow in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-02-06HouseFavorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2019-01-30HouseOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 02/06/19, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
2019-01-03HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2018-11-30HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S96 (Similar To) 2019-04-22 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
76716Amended CodeSee Bill Text
84319Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback