FL H0067 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-4)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Chapter No. 2018-31
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes Florida Slavery Memorial; provides for administration of memorial by DMS; directs DMS to develop specified plan & submit such plan to Governor & Legislature.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Slavery Memorial

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#538 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21 Chapter No. 2018-31
2018-03-19 Approved by Governor
2018-03-09 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-02-27HouseOrdered enrolled
2018-02-27SenatePassed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
2018-02-27SenateRead 3rd time
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-02-21SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-21SenateSubstituted for SB 286
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-21SenateWithdrawn from Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations
2018-02-01SenateReceived
2018-02-01SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations
2018-01-31SenateIn Messages
2018-01-25HousePassed; YEAS 109 NAYS 0
2018-01-25HouseRead 3rd time
2018-01-24HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-01-24HouseRead 2nd time
2018-01-18HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/24/18
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-11-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-11-07HouseFavorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0
2017-10-31HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 11/07/17, 1:30 pm, Morris Hall
2017-10-25HouseNow in Government Accountability Committee
2017-10-25HouseFavorable by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2017-10-18HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 10/25/17, 4:00 pm, Morris Hall
2017-10-11HouseNow in Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2017-10-11HouseFavorable by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2017-10-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, 10/11/17, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2017-08-30HouseReferred to Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-08-21HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S286 (Similar To) 2018-02-21 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 67

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
265006Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback