FL H0063 | 2018 | Regular Session


Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in returning Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]


Provides requirements for use of seclusion, restraint, & exclusionary & nonexclusionary time; revises school district policies & procedures; requires continuing education & inservice training relating to students with certain disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Students with Disabilities in Public Schools


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#30 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#801 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2018-03-10SenateDied in returning Messages
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-03-09SenateIn returning messages
2018-03-09HouseRefused to concur, requested Senate to recede
2018-03-09HouseRefused to concur in 1 amendment(s) (678432) 1135
2018-03-08HouseIn returning messages
2018-03-08SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2018-03-08SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-07SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-07SenateAmendment(s) adopted (678432) 841
2018-03-07SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-07SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 260
2018-03-07SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-07SenateWithdrawn from Education; Health Policy; Rules
2018-03-06SenateReferred to Education; Health Policy; Rules
2018-03-05SenateIn Messages
2018-03-05HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
2018-03-05HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-02HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-02HouseAmendment(s) adopted (672643)
2018-03-02HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-27HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/18
2018-01-25HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-01-25HouseFavorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2018-01-23HouseOn Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 01/25/18, 10:00 am, Reed Hall
2018-01-16HouseNow in Education Committee
2018-01-11HouseCS by PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-11HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-10HouseCS by PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2018-01-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee, 01/10/18, 1:00 pm, Reed Hall
2017-08-30HouseReferred to PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

S260 (Same As) 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 63

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1003573Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1012582Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

Bill Comments