FL H0061 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-07 - Now in Health and Human Services Committee
Pending: House Health And Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides eligibility to certain veterans & servicemembers for specified adoption benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adoption Benefits

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-07HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2019-11-06HouseFavorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2019-10-30HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 11/06/19, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2019-10-28HouseNow in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-10-24HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-10-24HouseCS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2019-10-17HouseOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 10/24/19, 9:30 am, 12 HOB
2019-09-23HouseReferred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-08-15HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S136 (Same As) 2019-11-15 - Now in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4091664Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback