FL H0059 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Ordered enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires comprehensive plans & certain land development regulations of municipalities effective after certain date to incorporate certain development orders; requires local governments to include property rights element in their comprehensive plans; provides statement of rights; requires local government to adopt property rights element within specified timeframe; provides that certain property owners are not required to consent to development agreement changes; provides requirements & procedures for right of first refusal; authorizes certain developments of regional impact agreements to be amended.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Growth Management

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#43 (Y: 82 N: 32 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08HouseOrdered enrolled
2021-04-08HouseIn Messages
2021-04-08SenateImmediately certified
2021-04-08SenateCS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2021-04-08SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-08SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-08SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/CS/SB 496
2021-04-08SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-04-08SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2021-04-07SenateReceived
2021-04-07HouseMessage sent to senate
2021-04-07SenateReferred to Rules
2021-04-07SenateIn Messages
2021-04-01HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 82, NAYS 32
2021-04-01HouseRead 3rd time
2021-03-31HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2021-03-31HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2021-03-31HouseAmendment 111799 adopted
2021-03-31HouseRead 2nd time
2021-03-26HouseAmendment 111799 filed
2021-03-25HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (3/31/2021)
2021-03-15HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2021-03-15HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2021-03-11House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 3)
2021-03-11HouseCS Filed
2021-03-11HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-03-11HouseReported out of State Affairs Committee
2021-03-10HouseFavorable with CS by State Affairs Committee
2021-03-08HouseAdded to State Affairs Committee agenda
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-02-22HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2021-02-22HouseReferred to State Affairs Committee
2021-02-18HouseCS Filed
2021-02-18HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-02-18HouseReported out of Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
2021-02-17HouseFavorable with CS by Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
2021-02-10HouseAdded to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda
2021-02-08HouseNow in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
2021-02-08HouseReferred to State Affairs Committee
2021-02-08HouseReferred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
2021-02-05HouseCS Filed
2021-02-05HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-02-05HouseReported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2021-02-04HouseFavorable with CS by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2021-01-28HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local Administration and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 02/04/21, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2021-01-15HouseReferred to Local Administration and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Civil Justice and Property Rights Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2020-12-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S496 (Similar To) 2021-04-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 59

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1633167Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1633177Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1633237Amended CodeSee Bill Text
33725Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38006Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/59
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/59/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/59/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/59/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/59/BillText/c3/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/59/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/59/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/59/Amendment/030435/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/59/Amendment/111799/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/59/Analyses/h0059.LAV.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/59/Analyses/h0059a.LAV.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/59/Analyses/h0059b.CIV.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/59/Analyses/h0059c.CIV.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/59/Analyses/h0059d.SAC.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/59/Analyses/h0059e.SAC.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/59/Vote/HouseVote_h00059e1043.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/59/Vote/SenateVote_h00059e1010.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback